US SR540 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution encourages (1) the people of the United States to join in a national effort to salute AmeriCorps members and alumni and to raise awareness about the importance of national and community service, and (2) all individuals to consider opportunities to serve in AmeriCorps. The resolution also acknowledges the accomplishments of AmeriCorps members, alumni, and community partners, and recognizes their important contributions to the lives of the people of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the contributions of AmeriCorps members and alumni to the lives of the people of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706) |
Same As/Similar To
HR227 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR899 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR127 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
HR899 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR127 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/540/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres540/BILLS-116sres540ats.pdf |