US SR544 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1761-1762)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1761-1762)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month and its goals and ideals.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of March 2020 as "National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1761-1762) |
Same As/Similar To
HR180 (Related) 2019-03-08 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2608)
HR880 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR105 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1799; text: CR S1797)
HR880 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR105 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1799; text: CR S1797)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/544/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres544/BILLS-116sres544is.pdf |