US SR549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates April 2020 as Second Chance Month to promote awareness of unnecessary legal and social barriers that prevent individuals with criminal records from becoming productive members of society.
Title
A resolution designating April 2020 as "Second Chance Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876) |
Same As/Similar To
HR210 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR102 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR928 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR102 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR928 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres549/BILLS-116sres549is.pdf |