US SR561 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week. It also recognizes the contributions of nurses to the U.S. health care system.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294) |
Same As/Similar To
HR368 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR951 (Same As) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR224 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117)
HR951 (Same As) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR224 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres561/BILLS-116sres561is.pdf |