US SR568 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States. This resolution thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to recognize National Teacher Appreciation Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)

Same As/Similar To

SR197 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748)
HR363 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR959 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback