US SR569 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of May 3-May 9, 2020, as Public Service Recognition Week. It also commends public servants for their contributions during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) crisis.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that, during Public Service Recognition Week, public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344) |
Same As/Similar To
HR353 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR949 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR180 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
HR949 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR180 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Military personnel and dependents
Worker safety and health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Military personnel and dependents
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres569/BILLS-116sres569ats.pdf |