US SR580 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631-6632)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631-6632)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week beginning on October 14, 2012, as National Wildlife Refuge Week. Encourages the observance of National Wildlife Refuge Week with appropriate events and activities. Reaffirms the support of the Senate for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning on October 14, 2012, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] |
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-22 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631-6632) |
Same As/Similar To
SR288 (Related) 2011-10-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354-6356; text as passed Senate: CR S6354-6355; text of measure as introduced: CR S6349)
Subjects
Animals
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/580/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres580/BILLS-112sres580ats.pdf |