US SR589 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2445-2555)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States. This resolution recognizes the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States. The resolution also recognizes that the Asian American and Pacific Islander communities enhance the rich diversity of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2445-2555)

Same As/Similar To

SR218 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3063-3064)
HR401 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR983 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback