US SR598 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2610; text: CR S2607-2608)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2610; text: CR S2607-2608)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Foster Care Month and for the designation of May 31, 2020, as National Foster Parent Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policies to improve the lives of children in the foster care system.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2610; text: CR S2607-2608) |
Same As/Similar To
HR340 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR966 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR226 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3118)
HR966 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR226 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3118)
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/598/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres598/BILLS-116sres598ats.pdf |