US SR613 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice. (text: CR S8379-8380)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice. (text: CR S8379-8380)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.) Urges European governments and the European Union (EU) to: (1) designate Hizballah as a terrorist organization so that Hizballah cannot use EU territories for fund raising, recruitment, and propaganda; and (2) impose sanctions on Hizballah for providing material support to Bashar al Assad's violent repression against the people of Syria. Supports Bulgaria's investigation into the July 18, 2012, terrorist attack in Burgas, and urges the President to provide related diplomatic, intelligence, and law enforcement support. Supports Bulgaria as a member of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) and urges the United States, NATO, and the EU to work with Bulgaria to safeguard its territory and citizens from terrorism. Urges the President to: (1) provide diplomatic, intelligence, and law enforcement support to Bulgaria to investigate the Burgas terrorist attack; and (2) make available to European allies and the European public information about Hizballah's terrorist activities and material support for Bashar al Assad's campaign of violence in Syria.
Title
A resolution urging the governments of Europe and the European Union to designate Hizballah as a terrorist organization and impose sanctions, and urging the President to provide information about Hizballah to the European allies of the United States and to support to the Government of Bulgaria in investigating the July 18, 2012, terrorist attack in Burgas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice. (text: CR S8379-8380) |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8379-8380) |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7745) |
Same As/Similar To
HR834 (Related) 2013-01-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Bulgaria
Collective security
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Europe
European Union
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Middle East
Palestinians
Sanctions
Syria
Terrorism
Bulgaria
Collective security
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Europe
European Union
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Middle East
Palestinians
Sanctions
Syria
Terrorism