US SR618 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating June 2020 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2020, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day". This resolution designates June 2020 as National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month and June 27, 2020, as National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day. The resolution supports (1) the education of members of the Armed Forces, veterans, their families, and the public about post-traumatic stress; and (2) efforts by the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense to foster cultural change around the issue of post-traumatic stress. The resolution also encourages the leadership of the Armed Forces to support treatment of members of the Armed Forces who suffer from post-traumatic stress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating June 2020 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2020, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3625)
2020-06-15SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HR455 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1006 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR220 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback