US SR620 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States. This resolution designates June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" to commemorate the end of slavery in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States.

Sponsors

Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]
Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT]
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2979; text: CR S2976)

Same As/Similar To

HR448 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR450 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1001 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR253 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3836; text: CR S3850)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback