US SR621 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2976-2977)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2976-2977)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates June 15, 2020, as World Elder Abuse Awareness Day.
Title
A resolution designating June 15, 2020, as "World Elder Abuse Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2976-2977) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3160) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR242 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/10/19 CR S3293)
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations