US SR623 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/16/2020 CR S3013)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/16/2020 CR S3013)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses remembrance for the life of Otto Frederick Warmbier on the third anniversary of his death. The resolution condemns North Korea for his death and calls for sanctions against North Korea to remain fully implemented until North Korea commits to the suspension of its proliferation of weapons of mass destruction.
Title
A resolution commemorating Otto Frederick Warmbier and condemning the North Korean regime for their continued human rights abuses.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/16/2020 CR S3013) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3091-3092) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1016 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
International affairs
Multilateral development programs
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
International affairs
Multilateral development programs
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
United Nations