US SR625 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1-1)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/12/2018 S6146-6146)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/12/2018 S6146-6146)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week beginning September 9, 2018, as "National Direct Support Professionals Recognition Week". Designates the week beginning September 9, 2018, as National Direct Support Professionals Recognition Week. Commends direct support professionals for being integral to long-term support and services for individuals with disabilities. Expresses the sense of the Senate that the successful implementation of the public policies affecting individuals with disabilities depends on the dedication of direct support professionals.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning September 9, 2018, as "National Direct Support Professionals Recognition Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/12/2018 S6146-6146) |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6349) |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6145-6146) |
Same As/Similar To
SR258 (Related) 2017-09-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5748; consideration: CR S5747-5748; text: CR S5747-5748)
Subjects
Allied health services
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health personnel
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health personnel