US SR664 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: CR S4637)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: CR S4637)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the week of September 20-September 26, 2020, as Gold Star Families Remembrance Week and recognizes the sacrifices made by veterans and by the families of Armed Forces members who made the ultimate sacrifice in order to defend freedom and protect the United States.
Title
A resolution designating the week of September 20 through September 26, 2020, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: CR S4637) |
Same As/Similar To
SR313 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/17/2019 S5542)
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/664/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres664/BILLS-116sres664ats.pdf |