US SR674 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2018 as "National Principals Month". Recognizes October 2018 as National Principals Month and supports its goals and ideals. Honors the contributions of principals in elementary, middle, and high schools in the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2018 as "National Principals Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7141) |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821) |
Same As/Similar To
HR517 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1116 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR306 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
HR1116 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR306 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820; text as passed Senate: CR S6819)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration