US SR692 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 2020 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Title
A resolution designating September 2020 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5612) |
Same As/Similar To
HR584 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1118 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR321 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
SR702 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
HR1118 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR321 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
SR702 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5711)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/692/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres692/BILLS-116sres692is.pdf |