US SR696 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5616; text: CR S5615)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5616; text: CR S5615)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 4, 2020, as National Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Day and recognizes the need for additional research to find a cure.
Title
A resolution designating September 4, 2020, as "National Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Day", and raising awareness and understanding of polycystic kidney disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5616; text: CR S5615) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1142 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR356 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/26/2019 CR S5757)
SR356 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/26/2019 CR S5757)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/696/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres696/BILLS-116sres696ats.pdf |