US SR708 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Concussion Awareness Day on September 18, 2020, and encourages efforts to mitigate the adverse effects of mild traumatic brain injuries.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of September 18, 2020, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713) |
Same As/Similar To
HR567 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1127 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR349 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755)
HR1127 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR349 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/708/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres708/BILLS-116sres708is.pdf |