US SR709 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5713-5714)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the August 13, 2020, and September 11, 2020, announcements of the establishment of full diplomatic relations between the State of Israel and the United Arab Emirates and the State of Israel and the Kingdom of Bahrain are historic achievements. This resolution expresses the sense of the Senate that the establishment of full diplomatic relations between Israel and the United Arab Emirates and between Israel and Bahrain are historic achievements. Further, it encourages other Arab nations to establish full relations with Israel, and it reaffirms the Senate's support for a negotiated, two-state solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the August 13, 2020, and September 11, 2020, announcements of the establishment of full diplomatic relations between the State of Israel and the United Arab Emirates and the State of Israel and the Kingdom of Bahrain are historic achievements.

Sponsors

Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]
Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]
Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5713-5714)

Same As/Similar To

HR1110 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR713 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5835)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback