US SR713 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5835)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5835)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution congratulates Israel and the United Arab Emirates and Israel and Bahrain on reaching their respective historic agreements. Further, it encourages other Arab nations to establish full relations with Israel, and it urges the President to continue engaging with Israel and U.S. Arab partners in reaching such agreements.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the August 13, 2020, announcement of the establishment of full diplomatic relations between the State of Israel and the United Arab Emirates and the September 11, 2020, announcement of the establishment of full diplomatic relations between the State of Israel and the Kingdom of Bahrain is a historic achievement.
Sponsors
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5835) |
Same As/Similar To
SR709 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5713-5714)
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Bahrain
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Arab Emirates
Bahrain
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Arab Emirates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/713/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres713/BILLS-116sres713is.pdf |