US SR735 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 29, 2020, as National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day.
Title
A resolution designating September 29, 2020, as "National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985) |
Same As/Similar To
SR324 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/24/2019 CR S5666)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/735/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres735/BILLS-116sres735ats.pdf |