US SR74 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - S.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution marking the fifth anniversary of Ukraine's Revolution of Dignity by honoring the bravery, determination, and sacrifice of the people of Ukraine during and since the Revolution, and condemning continued Russian aggression against Ukraine. This resolution affirms the U.S. government's support of Ukraine's democratic reforms, territorial integrity, and autocephaly for an independent Orthodox Church of Ukraine; honors the Ukrainians who fought in the 2014 Ukrainian Revolution; condemns Russia's military incursions and ongoing malicious activities toward Ukraine; asserts that the Nord Stream 2 pipeline presents a threat to European security and Ukraine's economy; and calls upon the U.S. government and its allies to maintain sanctions against Russia until it ceases to violate its international obligations towards Ukraine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution marking the fifth anniversary of Ukraine's Revolution of Dignity by honoring the bravery, determination, and sacrifice of the people of Ukraine during and since the Revolution, and condemning continued Russian aggression against Ukraine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateS.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-16SenateS.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S4862-4863; text: CR S4862-4863) To amend the preamble.
2019-07-16SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4860-4864; text: CR S4863-4864)
2019-07-16SenateThe committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-16SenateS.Amdt.926 Amendment SA 926 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-16SenateS.Amdt.926 Amendment SA 926 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S4861-4862; text: CR S4861-4862) In the nature of a substitute.
2019-07-16SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
2019-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-02-14SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback