US SR751 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S6404)
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S6404)
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of a national day of remembrance on October 23, 2020, for members of the U.S. Armed Forces who were killed or injured by the terrorist attack on the Marine Corps barracks in Beirut, Lebanon, on October 23, 1983.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of October 23, 2020, as a national day of remembrance of the tragic terrorist bombing of the United States Marine Corps barracks in Beirut, Lebanon, in 1983.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S6404) |
Same As/Similar To
HR515 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1197 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR374 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S6095)
HR1197 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR374 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S6095)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
Lebanon
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Terrorism
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
Lebanon
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/751/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres751/BILLS-116sres751is.pdf |