US SR753 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/22/2020 S6405)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/22/2020 S6405)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/22/2020 S6405) |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7112) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR387 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6304-6305)
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Family services
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Family services
Infectious and parasitic diseases