US SR767 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 10/26/2020 S6602-6603)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 10/26/2020 S6602-6603)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution congratulates the Tampa Bay Lightning for becoming the 2020 National Hockey League Stanley Cup champions.
Title
A resolution congratulating the Tampa Bay Lightning for winning the 2020 Stanley Cup Final.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 10/26/2020 S6602-6603) |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6679) |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1199 (Same As) 2020-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.