US SR81 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3294-3296; text: CR S3295-3296)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3294-3296; text: CR S3295-3296)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commemorates the life of Russian opposition leader Boris Nemtsov and his work promoting democracy and human rights, and condemns Russian President Vladimir Putin and his regime for targeting political opponents and attempting to cover up Nemtsov's assassination. It also calls on the Department of State to (1) impose sanctions on those involved; (2) report to Congress on the assassination; and (3) investigate whether Ramzan Kadyrov, the Russia-backed head of the Chechen Republic, has violated previously imposed U.S. sanctions.
Title
A resolution calling for accountability and justice for the assassination of Boris Nemtsov.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3294-3296; text: CR S3295-3296) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1543-1544) |
Same As/Similar To
HR156 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime
Visas and passports