US SR95 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2397; text: 3/5/2019 CR S1662)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the 198th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the 198th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2397; text: 3/5/2019 CR S1662)
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 60.
2019-04-04SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
2019-04-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback