UT HB0055 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substance Use Treatment and Assessment Decisions Amendments
Title
Substance Use Treatment and Assessment Decisions Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Comm - Held in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | House Comm - Held in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Criminal Code
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Human Services
Human Services Licensure
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Substance Abuse
Criminal Code
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Human Services
Human Services Licensure
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Substance Abuse
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0055.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0055.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0055.fn.pdf |