UT HB0101 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Distracted Driver Amendments
Title
Distracted Driver Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-14 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |