UT HB0102 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retaliation and Obstruction of Justice Amendments
Title
Retaliation and Obstruction of Justice Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Hall [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |