UT HB0113 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hygiene Tax Act
Title
Hygiene Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |