UT HB0123 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Feasibility Study for Air Quality Laboratory
Title
Feasibility Study for Air Quality Laboratory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Department of Administrative Services
Department of Environmental Quality
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources
Department of Administrative Services
Department of Environmental Quality
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources