UT HB0134 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Focus on Primary Classroom Teachers Program
Title
Focus on Primary Classroom Teachers Program
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nielson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-28 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-15 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-14 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-14 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-09 | House/ held for reconsideration in HINTRO | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |