UT HB0158 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data Privacy Amendments
Title
Data Privacy Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |