UT HB0160 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Refugee Continuing Education Program
Title
Refugee Continuing Education Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |