UT HB0165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Reimbursement for Required Medical Services Act
Title
State Reimbursement for Required Medical Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-24 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-16 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |