UT HB0238 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage License Fees Amendments
Title
Marriage License Fees Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |