UT HB0240 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver License Revisions
Title
Driver License Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |