UT HB0245 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Reinvestment Agency Revisions
Title
Community Reinvestment Agency Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-13 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-18 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Community Development and Renewal Agencies
Housing
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Housing
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation