UT HB0258 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Women's Cancer Screening Notification Amendments
Title
Women's Cancer Screening Notification Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-02 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |