UT HB0274 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adoption Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-08 House/ filed in HFILE
2012-03-08 House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2012-01-23 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2012-01-23 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2012-01-21 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK
2012-01-20 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2012-01-20 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2012-01-17 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-01-17 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-01-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback