UT HB0274 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jury Duty Exemption Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury Duty Exemption Modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2015-03-12 House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2015-02-10HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2015-02-10HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2015-02-06 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2015-02-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback