UT HB0274 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Retail Tobacco Business Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Tobacco Business Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-11SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-11SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-08SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-08SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-28SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-28SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-02-28HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-28HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-28HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-21HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback