UT HB0283 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor Adventure Commission Amendments
Title
Outdoor Adventure Commission Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-23 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-23 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 3 to # 4 in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-12 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-11 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-11 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3 in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Boards and Committees
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Natural Resources
Off-highway Vehicles
Outdoor Recreation
Parks and Recreation
Public Lands
Water
Wildlife
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Natural Resources
Off-highway Vehicles
Outdoor Recreation
Parks and Recreation
Public Lands
Water
Wildlife