UT HB0327 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Vaccination Requirement for Dogs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vaccination Requirement for Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2020-03-10HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee
2020-03-09HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2020-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback