UT HB0337 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional Competency Standards Amendments
Title
Professional Competency Standards Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Elderly
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Insurance
Insurance, Health
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Elderly
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Insurance
Insurance, Health
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupations and Professions