UT HB0448 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services Budgetary Procedures Amendments
Title
Department of Human Services Budgetary Procedures Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Human Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Human Services
Public Budgeting
Department of Human Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Human Services
Public Budgeting
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0448.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0448.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0448.fn.pdf |