UT HB0489 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wind Energy Facility Siting Amendments
Title
Wind Energy Facility Siting Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Energy
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Utilities Siting and Permitting
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Utilities Siting and Permitting
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0489.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0489.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0489.fn.pdf |